Financial history WHAT MAKES YOU DIFFERENT MAKES YOU BEAUTIFUL

Charity Number: 1166959
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £106.28k £177.52k £128.70k £111.36k £82.84k
Total expenditure £120.25k £136.35k £143.45k £122.98k £92.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.50k N/A N/A N/A