Financial history JORDAN RESTORATION MINISTRY

Charity number: 1165773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.05k £47.23k £40.17k £45.06k £45.59k
Total expenditure £36.31k £32.53k £47.48k £47.83k £50.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A