Financial history TALK ABOUT ART

Charity number: 1168412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £54.78k £10.82k £64.95k £56.82k £44.81k
Total expenditure £51.10k £38.44k £41.45k £52.38k £43.88k
Income from government contracts N/A £6.52k N/A N/A £3.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.99k N/A N/A