Financial history AVA HUNT THEATRE

Charity number: 1166244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.55k £37.06k £5.88k £5.31k £1.96k
Total expenditure £47.42k £22.86k £17.40k £5.49k £1.98k
Income from government contracts £12.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.81k £33.16k N/A N/A £810