Trustees DEMENTIA HARBOROUGH

Charity number: 1167885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK BINGHAM TITUS WATTS Chair 10 May 2023
None on record
Alison Elizabeth Gordon Cross Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Jonathan Paul Eyles Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
JAMES RUSSELL HENDERSON Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Jennifer Helen Friend Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Peter Hirst Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record
ANDREW GLENN HARTSHORN Trustee 26 November 2014
None on record
JANET MARGARET MEREDITH Trustee 27 November 2013
None on record
JANE FRASER Trustee 27 November 2013
None on record