Financial history POSTCARDS FOR PEACE

Charity number: 1168645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £429 £286 £127 £590 £1.08k
Total expenditure £785 £506 £126 £1.54k £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A