Financial history SAINT JOHN JACOB

Charity number: 1170617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £82.70k £337.55k £87.76k £563.86k £165.61k
Total expenditure £32.96k £35.01k £62.91k £78.37k £77.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.21k £3.70k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £563.86k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £365.00k N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £198.86k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £2.53k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £75.84k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A