Accounts and annual returns SOLIHULL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH RETIREMENT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 507602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 25 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 May 2024 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 May 2024 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 January 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2024 266 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 January 2024 629 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 January 2024 992 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 January 2024 992 days late Download Open in new window