Accounts and annual returns THE CHILDREN'S SPACE

Charity number: 1170148
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023
Annual return 31 August 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022
Annual return 31 August 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window