Financial history LLANISHEN EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1168317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.06k £39.14k £62.40k £128.67k £130.18k
Total expenditure £51.80k £43.57k £26.97k £67.47k £71.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.63k N/A