Financial history THE WEYMOUTH DANCE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1169047
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.96k £4.72k £11.55k £23.20k £25.12k
Total expenditure £19.18k £13.45k £15.54k £17.19k £21.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A