Financial history EAST LEEDS PIONEER (DAYSPRING CHURCH)

Charity number: 1168171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.39k £65.31k £56.53k £62.43k £56.37k
Total expenditure £93.33k £76.67k £73.77k £46.96k £50.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A