Financial history NEWARK AND SHERWOOD CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 1168029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.63k £63 £8.29k £14.07k £14.39k
Total expenditure £15.28k £920 £7.42k £10.63k £11.75k
Income from government contracts £585 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £500