Financial history POLLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 507683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.03k £10.49k £20.16k £5.73k £7.55k
Total expenditure £6.13k £4.01k £4.75k £8.20k £11.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.43k N/A N/A