Financial history HOPE2SLEEP

Charity number: 1168089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £305.00k £449.92k £473.38k £566.09k £594.24k
Total expenditure £286.88k £389.65k £430.29k £557.28k £571.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £4.76k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £10.45k £25.96k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £555.60k £568.22k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £47 £61
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £557.28k £571.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £4.10k £2.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0