Accounts and annual returns HOLLYVIEW ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1166114
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window