Financial history THE ZAK VALI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1168999
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £61.36k £29.14k £12.41k £5.99k £103
Total expenditure £44.52k £36.27k £33.40k £2.40k £3.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A