Financial history ASSOCIATION DES PARENTS D'ELEVES DU LYCEE INTERNATIONAL DE LONDRES

Charity number: 1169641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.81k £8.54k £25.90k £27.74k £22.71k
Total expenditure £6.57k £8.54k £25.87k £25.78k £23.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A