Financial history TAUNTON CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity number: 1166295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £19.96k £8.21k £13.31k £18.98k £15.89k
Total expenditure £29.76k £4.50k £5.64k £27.24k £14.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A