Accounts and annual returns WORKING FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE GENUINE ORTHODOX CHRISTIANS (G O C ) IN BIRMINGHAM

Charity Number: 507769
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 April 2025 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 April 2025 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 June 2024 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 July 2024 156 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window