Trustees PORTSKEWETT AND SUDBROOK PLAYING FIELDS AND RECREATION HALL

Charity number: 507780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart Cochrane Chair 28 June 2021
None on record
Hayley Wilsher Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Jamie Grannell Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Helen Steel Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Victoria Elliott Trustee 21 August 2022
None on record
Lisa Dymock Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Peter Nurcombe Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record