Financial history GRIMSBY TRINITY CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity Number: 1167353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £26.43k £40.85k £29.04k £37.31k £45.98k
Total expenditure £31.67k £38.23k £26.73k £44.78k £42.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £8.42k N/A £1.80k £1.80k