Financial history COUNTESS FREE CHURCH, ELY

Charity number: 1166937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £88.37k £70.78k £83.82k £98.04k £86.73k
Total expenditure £74.49k £120.32k £77.01k £79.59k £57.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £320 N/A N/A