Accounts and annual returns THE NO BARRIERS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1167536
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 22 March 2025 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 March 2025 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 22 March 2025 411 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 March 2025 776 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 March 2025 776 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 April 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 April 2022 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 April 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 April 2021 59 days late Download Open in new window