Financial history GREAT HOUSE REVIVAL MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1166815
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £48.61k £42.93k £68.78k £69.66k £65.87k
Total expenditure £50.46k £43.72k £65.26k £71.97k £63.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A