Accounts and annual returns GOOD NEWS RENEWAL MINISTRY (GNRM)

Charity number: 1167374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 26 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2023 26 February 2025 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 26 February 2025 362 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2022 14 June 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 26 February 2025 728 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2021 03 April 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 03 April 2022 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2020 14 May 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 14 May 2021 74 days late Download Open in new window