Accounts and annual returns UNDER THE CLOCK BRADFORD

Charity number: 1169131
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 July 2024 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 July 2024 80 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 July 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 11 July 2023 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required