Financial history THE FENNER FROST FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1167049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £77.59k £82.33k £54.05k £68.41k £64.80k
Total expenditure £48.63k £56.16k £71.80k £69.13k £76.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.60k £18.85k N/A £400 N/A