Accounts and annual returns LITTLE SUNBEAMS PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1167139
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late