Trustees MILTON KEYNES READER SERVICE
Charity number: 1169548

Regulatory alert

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ksenia Blake | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nana Frempong | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Clifton | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE CALVERT | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HARRISON | Trustee | 28 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY LAWRENCE BASHTON | Trustee | 29 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MARY PEARSON | Trustee | 30 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNN JULIA BOVIS | Trustee | 24 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Paula Margaret Suchy MBE | Trustee | 26 June 1993 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.