Financial history THE FERN PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1168892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £998.70k £964.81k £899.33k £960.98k £995.17k
Total expenditure £987.75k £878.20k £881.24k £955.44k £991.09k
Income from government contracts £299.40k £297.98k £270.29k £279.52k £397.45k
Income from government grants £68.00k £424.54k £264.68k £279.15k £95.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £189.44k £0 £122.75k £194.86k £220.26k
Income - Charitable activities £306.28k £151.81k £241.62k £486.60k £163.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £299.04k £813.01k £534.97k £279.52k £401.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £962.32k £807.35k £753.50k £720.92k £753.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £25.43k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.43k £70.85k £127.75k £234.52k £237.73k