Accounts and annual returns 558 (FINNINGLEY) SQUADRON AIR TRAINING CORPS

Charity number: 1171614
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 April 2025 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 November 2024 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 February 2023 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 April 2022 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required