Accounts and annual returns SANDS OF FAITH CHILD FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1167220
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2018 11 January 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 11 January 2019 14 days late
Annual return 28 February 2017 11 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 11 December 2017 On Time