Accounts and annual returns KELLYDELI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1168207
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 March 2021 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 March 2021 133 days late
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 February 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 February 2020 116 days late
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 March 2018 On Time