Accounts and annual returns THE LITTLE BROWN DOG RESCUE

Charity Number: 1170170
Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Annual return 01 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 444 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 444 days
Annual return 01 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 810 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 810 days
Annual return 01 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1175 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1175 days
Annual return 01 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days