Accounts and annual returns WATER OF LIFE INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN DEVOTIONS & PUBLICATION MINISTRY

Charity number: 1168746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 01 November 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 November 2024 460 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 November 2024 825 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 September 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 September 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required