Financial history DALTON-ON-TEES VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 508273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £3.21k £12.47k £9.65k £5.98k £2.37k
Total expenditure £1.53k £2.72k £9.66k £5.28k £2.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k N/A N/A N/A