Financial history LIFELINE GLOBAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1167865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.05k £30.45k £34.54k £32.24k £73.13k
Total expenditure £19.67k £65.98k £34.32k £43.04k £46.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.90k £15.68k N/A N/A