Linked charities STAFFORD SAMARITANS
Charity number: 1167807

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 19/11/1964
AS AMENDED ON 19/11/1981
AS AMENDED ON 16/11/1984
AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2003
AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2005
AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2007
AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN STAFFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE , IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT
Registration history
- 23 March 1965 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.