Financial history THE CULTURAL SANCTUARIES FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1168940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £202.71k £68.40k £56.46k £135.99k £27.47k
Total expenditure £195.80k £95.06k £69.92k £89.16k £85.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A