Trustees NEPALESE BRITISH COMMUNITY UK (NBC-UK)
Charity Number: 1170728

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMIR NATH PYAKURYAL | Chair | 20 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Shyam Koirala | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Parbati Devi Neupane | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suman Pradhan | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shreejana Koirala | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prakash Neupane | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dasharath Bashyal | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Prasanna Nepal | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damodar Acharya | Trustee | 03 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bhan Bahadur Chand | Trustee | 03 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rabindra Adhikari | Trustee | 03 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kul Sigdel | Trustee | 03 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAJENDRA OJHA | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TEJ MAYA REGMI SIGDEL | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RISHI KHANAL | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BASANTA NEPAL | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUMAN GURUNG | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KHEM RAJ JOSHI | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAM SUNDAR SHAH | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PRASUN RANA | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHURAMANI REGMI | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prabhu Ram Neupane | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Kiran Adhikari | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Lekh Ghimire | Trustee | 20 February 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.