Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ALBURY OLD SAXON CHURCH
Charity number: 1168550
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Elizabeth Gummer | Chair | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Badiali | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hammond | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN GODFREY | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY HOGBEN | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES GEORGE BAXTER | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE MARY FOULSHAM | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MONICA CASSELS | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE LOUISE HARLEY | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW MICHAEL PEARSON | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.