Financial history CRAKEHALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 508429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.77k £3.23k £6.61k £7.66k £8.68k
Total expenditure £6.97k £6.32k £7.98k £6.90k £14.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A