Accounts and annual returns GAINSHARE ACCOUNT RAF HALTON

Charity number: 1168439
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 August 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 August 2020 4 days late
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 18 February 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 February 2018 On Time