Accounts and annual returns DEEP GLOBAL

Charity number: 1171035
Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 06 March 2025 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 15 March 2022 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required