Financial history CANDO INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1171844
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £1.40m £288.93k £72.97k £237.64k £17.14k
Total expenditure £825.57k £775.85k £129.29k £215.28k £87.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.40m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £613.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £162.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £26.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £536.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £49.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A