Financial history TELEEEG

Charity Number: 1168877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £22.90k £36.27k £23.75k £44.08k £27.80k
Total expenditure £16.40k £12.07k £28.25k £40.25k £46.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A