Financial history DARLEY DALE PRESCHOOL AND NURSERY

Charity Number: 1168827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.13k £98.90k £89.80k £77.50k £149.71k
Total expenditure £108.84k £82.67k £100.79k £70.35k £136.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £90.25k £70.91k £57.97k £115.14k
Income from government grants £71.30k N/A N/A N/A £900