Financial history THE PHOENIX THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 508668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £32.63k £33.07k £29.47k £32.56k £41.64k
Total expenditure £32.93k £9.66k £24.98k £34.00k £33.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.43k £8.00k N/A N/A