Financial history FOUNTAIN OF WISDOM MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1169984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £208.06k £194.79k £275.68k £260.11k £269.44k
Total expenditure £202.74k £183.15k £217.75k £231.19k £262.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A